Financial history FOUR OAKS PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1041584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £83.21k £92.11k £88.66k £75.33k £95.74k
Total expenditure £76.16k £70.13k £81.21k £80.27k £96.76k
Income from government contracts £47.92k £66.70k £56.13k £57.12k £71.66k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A