AUTISM AT KINGWOOD

Charity number: 1041924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.74m £5.04m £5.81m £6.93m £7.62m
Total expenditure £4.75m £4.91m £5.77m £6.72m £7.75m
Income from government contracts £4.12m £4.50m £5.27m £5.39m £7.57m
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £98.50k £47.34k £15.54k £54.55k £39.02k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.63m £4.98m £5.79m £6.74m £7.57m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £526 £796 £84 £642 £4.38k
Income - Other £10.63k £6.14k £8.15k £135.45k £4.35k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.74m £4.91m £5.76m £6.70m £7.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.89k £1.01k £7.59k £14.10k £25.81k
Expenditure - Governance £34.46k £36.79k £36.31k £40.93k £35.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0