AUTISM AT KINGWOOD

Charity number: 1041924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Finney Trustee 22 September 2020 None on record
SANDRA MEADOWS Trustee None on record
Steven Bastiman-Davies Trustee 22 October 2019 None on record
Dr Steven Carnaby Trustee 06 November 2018 None on record
Rebecca Vickers Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
Lisa Basford Trustee 29 April 2020 None on record
David Swann Trustee 01 September 2017
BAKER AND TUCKER ALMSHOUSE CHARITY (OTHERWISE BOURTON ALMSHOUSES) Received: On time