FRIENDS OF BREDON HILL ACADEMY

Charity number: 1042022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £9.00k £10.24k £10.24k £4.36k £0
Total expenditure £9.24k £8.44k £8.45k £2.31k £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A