THE SELBY TRUST

Charity number: 1042095
Charity reporting is up to date (54 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £969.45k £996.29k £1.09m £1.14m £1.21m
Total expenditure £946.08k £926.89k £1.03m £1.02m £1.14m
Income from government contracts £13.00k £30.11k N/A £187.47k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £163.00k £201.61k £187.47k £187.47k
Income - Donations and legacies £170.89k £176.26k £171.03k £166.76k £166.74k
Income - Other trading activities £747.30k £763.01k £825.72k £846.12k £854.40k
Income - Charitable activities £42.36k £56.44k £81.92k £126.17k £189.75k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £132 £372 £286 £173 £2.30k
Income - Other £8.77k £209 £8.66k £2.72k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £251.42k £260.56k £264.22k £346.17k £413.44k
Expenditure - Raising funds £664.15k £634.85k £728.28k £628.02k £661.57k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £23.70k £30.73k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £30.50k £31.48k £41.67k £41.96k £64.91k