Trustees FOLLIFOOT PARK DISABLED RIDERS GROUP
Charity number: 1042415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Morag Bennett | Chair | 25 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Jane Chennells | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Haigh | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Anne Barwick | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETER NELSON | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANN GANNON | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lyn Julie Cowburn | Trustee | 23 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUE OXLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.