8TH PENWORTHAM (ST TERESA'S) SCOUT GROUP COUNCIL

Charity number: 1042722
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 02 November 2020 276 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 15 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required