8TH PENWORTHAM (ST TERESA'S) SCOUT GROUP COUNCIL

Charity number: 1042722
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £21.47k £22.58k £24.32k £27.16k £23.33k
Total expenditure £16.58k £24.48k £22.50k £26.77k £26.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A