Financial history PARK HILL JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1043652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £10.52k £8.35k £7.87k £4.65k £5.67k
Total expenditure £8.40k £7.65k £9.45k £5.51k £3.72k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A