Trustees PARK HILL JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1043652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anastasia Makris Chair 27 September 2017
None on record
Emma Stark Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record
Helen Elizabeth Brown Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record
Jane Dashwood Trustee 21 November 2019
None on record
Catherine Stewart Trustee 31 October 2019
None on record
Christopher Strelluf Trustee 12 September 2018
None on record
Michelle Kitchen Trustee 27 September 2017
None on record
Sara Hattersley Trustee 12 September 2017
None on record
Craig Bexon Trustee 12 September 2016
None on record
ELIZABETH BIGGS Trustee 01 October 2014
None on record