1ST ABERCARN SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1043715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.13k £4.54k £7.95k £4.76k £18.40k
Total expenditure £4.64k £4.47k £5.12k £8.33k £5.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £14.00k