Accounts and annual returns HARLESTON FORGET-ME-NOT CLUB
Charity number: 1043880
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2006 | 12 April 2007 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2005 | 22 February 2006 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2004 | 04 March 2005 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2004 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window