Accounts and annual returns BARNHILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1044033
Charity reporting is up to date (64 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 April 2022 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 April 2022 64 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 02 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 February 2019 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 02 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 04 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window