ANIMALS AT RISK SHELTER

Charity number: 1044094
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 01 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 August 2016 On time Download