Trustees 1ST SALTNEY (ST MARKS) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1044268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD DESMOND DE BEGER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sian Elizabeth Eastwood | Trustee | 16 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Ivers | Trustee | 16 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Gregory Higginbotham | Trustee | 16 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sian Jean Clark | Trustee | 16 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Fielder | Trustee | 16 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nan Eleri Higginbotham | Trustee | 16 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Eastwood | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Elizabeth Dilworth | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Jeffery | Trustee | 14 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karl Feakes | Trustee | 21 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALAN JOHN WILDING | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr DANIEL JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.