Financial history 2ND MALVERN SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1044413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £30.51k £50.61k £49.93k £27.37k £29.81k
Total expenditure £32.56k £33.41k £48.72k £22.98k £25.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £450 N/A N/A £10.00k £8.00k