Financial history AL-NOOR YOUTH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1044484
Charity reporting is overdue by 1333 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £19.05k £11.32k £14.64k £0 £0
Total expenditure £18.06k £14.02k £13.80k £348 £252
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0