Accounts and annual returns GARWAY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1044667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 03 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 31 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 08 July 2021 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 08 July 2021 153 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 25 October 2020 263 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 25 October 2020 263 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 07 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 07 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window