Financial history GARWAY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1044667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £700.87k £94.77k £100.88k £20.75k £15.25k
Total expenditure £8.32k £33.00k £18.87k £14.23k £11.46k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £19.43k £10.67k
Income - Donations and legacies £550 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £700.30k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £9 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.32k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A