Trustees ST NICHOLAS CE(VC) SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1044905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kelly Stiles Chair 01 September 2017
None on record
Elizabeth Smith Trustee 13 March 2023
None on record
Georgina Elisabeth Cockburn Trustee 20 September 2022
None on record
Amy Rockall Trustee 01 June 2018
None on record
Stacey Wall Trustee 26 April 2016
None on record