Accounts and annual returns WEST OXFORD ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity number: 1045203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 13 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 13 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 30 December 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 30 December 2020 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2019 09 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 09 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2018 21 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 21 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2017 24 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 24 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window