AL BADR ISLAMIC TRUST

Charity number: 1045362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 December 2019 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 December 2019 46 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 January 2018 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 26 January 2018 87 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 07 December 2016 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 07 December 2016 37 days late Download