Financial history WAVENEY ENTERPRISES WORKSHOP

Charity number: 1045523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £102.29k £99.84k £110.63k £119.84k £93.03k
Total expenditure £101.85k £102.42k £100.84k £88.99k £103.16k
Income from government contracts £75.86k £76.85k £90.39k £107.79k £81.96k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A