SOUTH ENGLAND CONFERENCE OF SEVENTH DAY ADVENTISTS

Charity number: 1045587

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pastor Emmanuel Osei Chair 19 September 2011
SEVENTH-DAY ADVENTIST ASSOCIATION LIMITED
NEWBOLD COLLEGE Received: On time
BRITISH UNION CONFERENCE OF SEVENTH-DAY ADVENTISTS Received: On time
ADVENTIST RADIO LONDON Received: On time
THE STANBOROUGH PRESS LIMITED Received: On time
Isha Scott Trustee 08 September 2019 None on record
Esther Aryee Trustee 06 September 2015 None on record
Dr Sorin Petrof Trustee 08 September 2019 None on record
Dwayne Lawson Trustee 08 September 2019
ADVENTIST RADIO LONDON Received: On time
Candy Layson Trustee 08 September 2019 None on record
Pastor Wayne Erasmus Trustee 14 January 2018 None on record
Julita Francois Trustee 08 September 2019 None on record
Abigail Wright Trustee 06 September 2015 None on record
Pastor Douglas William McCormac Trustee 06 September 2015 None on record
Pastor Anthony Fuller Trustee 06 September 2015 None on record
Pastor Hezron Adingo Trustee 19 December 2019 None on record
Pastor Michael Andrew Salmon Trustee 08 September 2019 None on record
Abigail Lianne Wright-Stephenson Trustee 08 September 2019 None on record
Grist Wilbur Mutambara Trustee 19 September 2021 None on record
Pastor Bernard Akakpo Trustee 08 September 2019 None on record
Pastor Samuel Ouadjo Trustee 08 September 2019 None on record
Judy Clements Trustee 08 September 2019
TOGETHER FOR MENTAL WELLBEING Received: On time
ST DUNSTAN'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Kwasi Dankwa Trustee 08 September 2019 None on record
Dr Nomsa Ruth Maphango Trustee 08 September 2019 None on record
Natalie Greaves Henry Trustee 08 September 2019 None on record