Accounts and annual returns Dovery Academy Parents Association

Charity number: 1045766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 23 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 13 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 05 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required