2ND REDRUTH (ST ANDREWS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1046451
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 February 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 March 2018 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 February 2017 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required