HORDER HEALTHCARE

Charity number: 1046624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £29.97m £31.64m £29.89m £29.16m £29.17m
Total expenditure £28.81m £32.22m £35.63m £30.36m £29.13m
Income from government contracts £22.09m £23.81m £21.70m £20.70m £19.05m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £215.00k £129.00k £56.00k £96.00k £127.00k
Income - Other trading activities £886.00k £1.30m £1.39m £1.52m £1.46m
Income - Charitable activities £28.31m £30.04m £28.23m £27.36m £27.43m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £211.00k £170.00k £204.00k £191.00k £102.00k
Income - Other £352.00k £0 £2.00k £0 £47.00k
Income - Legacies £158.00k £75.00k £9.00k £70.00k £102.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £28.79m £31.61m £31.50m £30.36m £29.13m
Expenditure - Raising funds £20.00k £22.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £190.00k £78.00k £63.00k £92.00k £67.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £590.00k £4.13m £2.00k £0