Financial history LINCOLNSHIRE EMPLOYMENT ACCOMMODATION PROJECT LIMITED

Charity number: 1046933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £902.15k £1.02m £911.67k £1.21m £1.72m
Total expenditure £829.49k £948.97k £832.38k £1.05m £1.03m
Income from government contracts £0 £160.85k £160.85k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.46k N/A N/A £30.67k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.89k £34.06k £21.96k £30.21k £580.13k
Income - Other trading activities £65.54k £65.55k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £699.00k £666.82k £758.75k £1.04m £1.01m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £135.71k £135.71k £130.95k £137.42k £134.10k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £754.13k £948.97k £832.38k £1.05m £1.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £75.36k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £6.60k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0