Financial history ORIGIN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1046975
Charity reporting is overdue by 419 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.85k £802 £2.47k £1.26k £1.45k
Total expenditure £1.85k £802 £2.47k £1.26k £1.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A