Accounts and annual returns BRIXTON CITY CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1047135
Charity reporting is overdue by 164 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 164 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 164 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 09 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 12 July 2022 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 07 March 2021 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 10 February 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required