Financial history GROVEPALM LIMITED

Charity number: 1047427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £21.55k £28.00k £45.01k £56.00k £80.30k
Total expenditure £19.56k £25.07k £45.92k £60.70k £86.05k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A