Financial history ASHFIELD PLAY CARE SCHEME

Charity number: 1047469
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £82.57k £77.84k £86.86k £74.22k £48.89k
Total expenditure £87.42k £76.94k £85.22k £69.30k £57.88k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k £8.00k