Financial history Action Against Hunger UK

Charity number: 1047501
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £31.35m £42.96m £45.99m £50.79m £2.00m
Total expenditure £31.33m £43.02m £46.36m £51.27m £1.17m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £19.80m £33.52m £27.64m £36.74m N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.79m £4.12m £4.38m £3.57m £1.93m
Income - Other trading activities £11.77k £40.13k £0 £10.80k £12.78k
Income - Charitable activities £26.55m £38.77m £41.58m £46.95m £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.01k £5.06k £10.59k £5.03k £684
Income - Other £2.62k £0 £17.31k £255.41k £52.92k
Income - Legacies £16.65k £19.53k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £29.41m £40.70m £44.39m £49.62m £0
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.92m £2.32m £1.98m £1.64m £1.17m
Expenditure - Governance £98.32k £0 £66.26k £116.41k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0