Financial history OAKDALE RESIDENTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1047652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.59k £6.21k £6.53k £6.82k £363
Total expenditure £22.09k £12.01k £7.81k £7.24k £896
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A