Financial history ACTIVE NATION UK LTD

Charity number: 1047742
Charity reporting is overdue by 60 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £14.16m £14.50m £15.84m £15.56m £8.47m
Total expenditure £14.10m £14.59m £15.79m £16.51m £9.84m
Income from government contracts £1.35m £1.33m £1.42m N/A N/A
Income from government grants £62.68k £209.12k £172.59k £3.41m £1.96m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £783.25k £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £693.47k £613.18k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £12.80m £12.93m £14.31m £15.56m £8.47m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £669.47k £959.53k £741.95k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £13.49m £14.02m £15.12m £15.86m £9.65m
Expenditure - Raising funds £603.07k £565.55k £673.55k £654.52k £189.21k
Expenditure - Governance £803.55k £763.55k £823.25k £943.96k £658.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0