TY HAFAN

Charity number: 1047912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sian Thomas Trustee 29 May 2019 None on record
James Pepper Trustee 09 April 2020 None on record
Dr Sara Helen Matthews Trustee 19 January 2021 None on record
Dr Simon Keith Holgate Trustee 20 April 2017 None on record
Dr Huw Jenkins Trustee 03 May 2018 None on record
Martin Davies Chair 11 December 2014 None on record
Susanna Carter Trustee 09 December 2019 None on record
Elizabeth Thomas Trustee 29 May 2019 None on record
Michael McGuire Trustee 19 January 2021 None on record