2ND NORTHOLT (WOOD END) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1048150
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £26.83k £24.44k £26.20k £18.22k £29.95k
Total expenditure £26.00k £26.83k £20.89k £14.25k £15.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £9.63k £8.00k £5.00k £20.00k