Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1048159
Charity reporting is overdue by 169 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 169 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 169 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required