Trustees AGE UK WALTHAM FOREST

Charity number: 1048212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Deborah Ladds Chair 08 March 2017
None on record
Pauline Martindale Trustee 06 December 2019
THE ROWANTREE CHOIR
Received: 132 days late
Richard Freitag Trustee 06 December 2019
None on record
Graham Forsdyke Trustee 05 December 2019
None on record
Nancy O'Brien Trustee 14 September 2017
None on record
Barry Coidan Trustee 29 September 2016
None on record
YVONNE VICTORIA UTILDA O'SULLIVAN Trustee
None on record
JEFFREY BLAY Trustee
None on record