Financial history WARRINER SCHOOL FARM TRUST

Charity number: 1048302
Charity reporting is overdue by 75 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.07k £12.01k £10.52k £1.99k £5.07k
Total expenditure £46.72k £4.35k £8.18k £3.20k £3.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A