Financial history FRIENDS OF DOWNHAM FEOFFEES PRIMARY ACADEMY

Charity number: 1048362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2018 01/01/2019 01/01/2020 01/01/2021 01/01/2022
Total gross income £10.23k £8.88k £8.61k £2.83k £5.64k
Total expenditure £10.06k £7.41k £7.09k £3.07k £6.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A