FRIENDS OF BOURNE WESTFIELD COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1048383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £10.60k £13.37k £15.21k £13.81k £6.53k
Total expenditure £5.60k £14.71k £11.92k £17.10k £13.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A