Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF MORLEY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1048573
Charity reporting is overdue by 21 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £4.04k £7.58k £7.11k £8.52k £5.23k
Total expenditure £4.46k £6.13k £6.73k £8.84k £3.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A