CAT ACTION TRUST - NORTH AND WEST WILTSHIRE

Charity number: 1048779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £47.16k £47.08k £39.50k £53.10k £37.96k
Total expenditure £38.11k £38.11k £36.31k £35.35k £32.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £10.00k £10.00k