Trustees MORLEY ELDERLY ACTION
Charity number: 1048838
Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Madden | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michaela Hamilton | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Smythe | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Twohey | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Lynch | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARY SIDGWICK | Trustee | 04 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS LEADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.