Dogfen lywodraethu THE NO WAY TRUST LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 JULY 1994 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS ON 25 AUGUST 1995, 8 MARCH 2004 AND 19 JANUARY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 SEP 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE ABOUT THE RISKS AND PENALTIES OF CRIMINAL ACTIVITY AND BY PERSUASION AND EDUCATION TO PREVENT THE COMMISSION OF CRIMINAL OFFENCES IN SO FAR AS SUCH OBJECTS ARE CHARITABLE IN LAW (2) TO ASSIST AND SUPPORT CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.