Financial history MANSFIELD GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS

Charity number: 1049110
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.16k £1.01k £589 £728 £223
Total expenditure £947 £885 £837 £798 £270
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A