Accounts and annual returns SHEFFIELD LIVING WATERS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1049186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 06 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 23 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 14 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 05 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2019 03 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 25 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2018 11 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 23 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2017 03 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 11 May 2017 On time Download Open in new window