Financial history GO 89

Charity number: 1049415
Charity reporting is overdue by 1189 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £100 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £915 £1.21k £213 £585 £615
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0