TAVISTOCK AND PORTMAN CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1049530
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £77.00k £73.90k £86.95k £199.22k £32.36k
Total expenditure £82.00k £104.04k £92.10k £94.00k £35.34k